Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lg 68 Doe, Lg Sixtyeight Doe, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Croglio, Christina Marie, Keller, Amy Christine, against Church Of Saints Anthony And Joseph, Church Of Saints Anthony & Joseph, Roman Catholic Dioceses Of Albany New York, represented by Costello, Michael L., Flynn, Marie Denise, in the jurisdiction of Herkimer County, NY, . Herkimer County, NY Superior Courts with Jeffrey Tait presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey Tait Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHerkimer County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
ANSWER
Date: September 24, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 09, 2021NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI)
Date: April 04, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 12, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 07, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 23, 2023COUNTY CLERK CERTIFICATION OF MINUTES
Date: March 24, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 23, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 01, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 24, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 24, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 31, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 11, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 24, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 11, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: October 22, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 12, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 24, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 08, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 12, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 17, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 24, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 31, 2020COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: September 03, 2021CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: September 03, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 01, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 17, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 24, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
June 23, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge Tait 6/23/23 |
||
May 23, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
April 04, 2023 |
NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI) Notice of Filing Chapter 11 |
||
February 01, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
August 01, 2022 |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Amended Preliminary Conference Order for Child Victim Act Cases |
||
March 24, 2022 |
COUNTY CLERK CERTIFICATION OF MINUTES ef2020-107166 consolidated with ef2020-107165 |
||
March 24, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Stipulated Order to Consolidate |
||
December 09, 2021 |
ORDER - OTHER Letter Order Resetting Discovery Deadlines |
||
December 07, 2021 |
ANSWER Mailed to Clerk on 9/22/20 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.