Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Other case in the jurisdiction of Herkimer County. This case was filed in Herkimer County Superior Courts with HON. ERIN P. GALL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. ERIN P. GALL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2014 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHerkimer County, NY |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2015 | Hearing |
PRE-DECIDED GALL (Court Activity) Judge: HON. ERIN P. GALL |
|
May 14, 2015 | Hearing |
HEARING HELD GALL (Hearing) Judge: HON. ERIN P. GALL |
|
January 23, 2014 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) GALL (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ERIN P. GALL |
|
December 17, 2013 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE GALL (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: HON. ERIN P. GALL |
|
November 07, 2013 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE GALL (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: HON. ERIN P. GALL |
|
October 02, 2013 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE GALL (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: HON. ERIN P. GALL |
|
October 02, 2013 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) GALL (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ERIN P. GALL |
|
September 05, 2013 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE GALL (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: HON. ERIN P. GALL |
|
September 05, 2013 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) GALL (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ERIN P. GALL |
|
July 18, 2013 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE GALL (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: HON. ERIN P. GALL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.