Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Herkimer County, NY, . Herkimer County, NY Superior Courts with HON. MICHAEL E. DALEY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. MICHAEL E. DALEY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2010 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationHerkimer County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time175 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2010 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT DALEY (Court Activity) Judge: HON. MICHAEL E. DALEY |
|
December 02, 2010 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) DALEY (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL E. DALEY |
|
July 06, 2010 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) DALEY (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL E. DALEY |
|
June 11, 2010 | Motion |
SJ (Motion #001) Decided: 12/02/2010GRANTED Before Justice: HON. MICHAEL E. DALEY Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. MICHAEL E. DALEY |
|
June 11, 2010 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) DALEY (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL E. DALEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.