Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Capital Restoration Services, Llc, filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case represented by Buchbinder, Paul Gary, Rubin, Daniel Sidney Lawrence, against Ashley N. Burgan, Daniel G. Burgan, Newrez Llc, represented by Gosselin, Kurt Michael, Harwick, John F, in the jurisdiction of Greene County, NY, . Greene County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2023 |
CategoryOther Real Property - Foreclosure On Mechanic'S Lien |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGreene County, NY |
Matter TypeLiens |
This legal document is a foreclosure proceeding filed by Capital Restoration Services, LLC (CRS) against Daniel G. Burgan, Ashley N. Burgan, and Newrez LLC. The complaint alleges a contract dispute regarding fire, smoke, and water damage mitigation a...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 08, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 09, 2024STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: January 12, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 08, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D *Corrected*
Date: December 11, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B *Corrected*
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C *Corrected*
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A *Corrected*
Date: December 11, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2024 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | ||
January 09, 2024 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
January 08, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Ashley Burgan |
||
January 08, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Daniel Burgan |
||
January 03, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Newrez LLC |
||
December 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D *Corrected* Filed Affidavit of Service |
||
December 11, 2023 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
December 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B *Corrected* Written Contract |
||
December 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C *Corrected* Mechanic's Lien |
||
December 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A *Corrected* Estimate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.