Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stanislaus, Brandon Glenn, against Renee Rieseberg, in the jurisdiction of Greene County, NY, . Greene County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGreene County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
This legal document is a complaint filed by American Express National Bank against Renee Rieseberg. The complaint alleges that Rieseberg entered into a credit agreement with the bank, but has since defaulted on the terms. The bank is seeking a total ...
ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: November 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 14, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A *Corrected*
Date: October 23, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: October 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 15, 2023 |
ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL MAILING MAILED 11/16/2023 |
||
November 14, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 23, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A *Corrected* Credit Statement |
||
October 23, 2023 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* Renee Rieseberg |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.