Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Brian Mahoney, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Greenberg, Mark D, against Richard Wyant, represented by Benoit, Daniel Arthur, in the jurisdiction of Greene County, NY, . Greene County, NY Superior Courts with Sharon Graff presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Assault/Battery) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGreene County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Greene. The plaintiff, Brian Mahoney, is suing the defendant, Richard Wyant, for assault and battery, intentional infliction of emotional distress, and punitive damages...
ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 04, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: January 29, 2024COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: December 12, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 22, 2024REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: January 17, 2024DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 05, 2024REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: December 01, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 24, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 24, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 05, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: October 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 22, 2024 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
January 17, 2024 |
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Reply to Defendant's Second Counterclaims |
||
January 05, 2024 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Supplemental Demand |
||
January 04, 2024 |
ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Answer to Second Amended Complaint |
||
December 12, 2023 | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | ||
December 01, 2023 | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | ||
November 24, 2023 | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
November 24, 2023 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | ||
October 19, 2023 | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.