Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Clare Felice, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Weaver, Ann M., against Andrew Gray, in the jurisdiction of Greene County, NY, . Greene County, NY Superior Courts with Sharon Graff presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2023 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGreene County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2024 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION | ||
January 18, 2024 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION | ||
January 17, 2024 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION | ||
January 17, 2024 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
December 30, 2023 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
December 08, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 07, 2023 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
December 07, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE STIPULATION/ORDER CONTESTED MATRIMONIAL (PROPOSED) | ||
November 30, 2023 | RETAINER AGREEMENT | ||
November 10, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.