Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Catalino M Hernandez, Sofia M Hernandez, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Alonso, Mark J., Facher, Catania Trigo, Ter-Grigoryan, Karine, against Eduardo Romero-Jimenez, John Does, represented by Salta, Romeo J, in the jurisdiction of Greene County, NY, . Greene County, NY Superior Courts with Richard Mott presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Constructive Trust) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationGreene County, NY |
Matter TypeTrusts |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Greene. The plaintiffs, Catalino Hernandez Maldonado and Sofia Merino Hernandez, are seeking to establish ownership interests in a property located at 8...
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 18, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 27, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 18, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 22, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: November 22, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: December 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: September 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: September 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: September 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: September 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: September 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: September 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 27, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 27, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Exhibit L - Notice to Defendant's Atty Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 27, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: September 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: September 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) KTG Affirmation in Further Support |
||
December 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Mortgage 1 - 845 Main |
||
December 18, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Sofia Aff in Further Support |
||
December 18, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | ||
December 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Mortgage 2 - 1193 County Route |
||
December 18, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Kavkos Affidavit |
||
December 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Zillow Emails |
||
November 22, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) | ||
November 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Pictures of house interior |
||
November 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Bank Check to cover closing costs |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.