Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Selip, Mitchell Howard, Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Ryan Quick, in the jurisdiction of Greene County, NY, . Greene County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGreene County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Greene. The plaintiff, Discover Bank, is suing the defendant, Ryan Quick, for breach of the agreement related to a revolving credit account. Discover Bank alleges that ...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: September 15, 2023ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: December 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 30, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: November 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 30, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 04, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: November 30, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: December 01, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: November 30, 2023ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 04, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 15, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: November 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2023 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
December 01, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 30, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT AOF |
||
November 30, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION MILITARY |
||
November 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENT |
||
November 30, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION SIGNED NON-SOL |
||
November 30, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION SIGNED PJTAFF |
||
November 30, 2023 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SIGNED DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
||
October 16, 2023 |
ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL MAILING MAILED 10/17/20023 |
||
October 04, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.