Case Last Refreshed: 10 hours ago
And Warranty Solutions Management Corporation,, Ws Aftermarket Services Corporation, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Carluccio, Charles Goldhammer, Hillmann, Donald James, Saunders, Blake Curtis, against And Rebecca Schatzel, In Her Individual Capacity,, Larissa Ortiz D B A We Cover That, Larissa Ortiz, In Her Individual Capacity, Peter Schatzel, In His Individual Capacity, We Cover That, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Greene County, NY, . Greene County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Sharon Graff presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSharon Graff Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 26, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGreene County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 24, 2024DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 23, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 18, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 18, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 18, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: March 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 18, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 29, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 18, 2024DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 24, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 18, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 25, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 18, 2024ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 16, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY *Corrected*
Date: January 25, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 16, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 31, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 16, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: April 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 21, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: April 26, 2023SUMMONS
Date: April 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service 04-24-2024 |
||
April 24, 2024 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY *Corrected* Notice of Entry for Default Judgment 04-24-2024 |
||
April 23, 2024 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2) | ||
April 18, 2024 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #2) Letter to Court re Motion for Default Judgment (#002) 04-18-2024 |
||
March 18, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service 03-18-2024 |
||
March 18, 2024 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) Memorandum of Law in Support of Default Judgment 03-18-2024 |
||
March 18, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #2) Exhibit J - LT Judge Graff re Default Motion |
||
March 18, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #2) Exhibit I - AoS - NOE |
||
March 18, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #2) Exhibit H - Notice of Entry 01-25-2024 |
||
March 18, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) Exhibit G - Decision + Order (01-24-24) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.