Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hoefs, Michael John, against Evelyn Truesdell A K A Olis Truesdell, in the jurisdiction of Greene County, NY, . Greene County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGreene County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Facts by Original Creditor Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 02, 2021ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: December 02, 2021AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Non-Military Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 02, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: December 02, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: July 25, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 09, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: December 02, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: December 02, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: December 02, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 12, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
June 09, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 02, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Facts by Original Creditor Redacted per 22 NYCRR Affidavit of Facts by Original Creditor Redacted |
||
December 02, 2021 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
December 02, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Non-Military Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR Affirmation of Non-Military Service Redacted |
||
December 02, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 02, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Supplemental Affirmation |
||
December 02, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
December 02, 2021 | Affirmation of Non-Expiration of SOL | ||
August 16, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT COY OF ADDITIONAL NOTICE / MAILED OUT 08/17/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.