Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kevin D Harman, Kimberlee J Harman, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Howard, Michael C., against Karen A Ballantine, Roger D Ballantine, represented by Kagan, Scott Daniel, Perley, Michael Francis, in the jurisdiction of Greene County, NY, . Greene County, NY Superior Courts with Adam W Silverman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGreene County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 28, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND Medical Authorizations
Date: August 26, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 19, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 26, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 26, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 26, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 28, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 08, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
August 26, 2021 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Medical Authorizations Medical Authorizations Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
August 26, 2021 | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
August 26, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Plaintiffs' Combined Discovery Demands |
||
August 26, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 26, 2021 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION | ||
August 19, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
August 18, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 02, 2021 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.