Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jasmin Garuc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Rowley, David Clute, against Nancy Bower, As Assessor Of The Town Of Durham, The Board Of Assessment Review Of The Town Of Durham, The Town Of Durham, represented by Rappleyea, Tal Gene, in the jurisdiction of Greene County, NY, . Greene County, NY Superior Courts with Adam W Silverman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 22, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGreene County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
PETITION
Date: July 22, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 22, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 06, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 28, 2021NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S)
Date: July 22, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: December 01, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 30, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 28, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: July 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 06, 2021 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Stipulation and Order of Settlement |
||
December 01, 2021 | STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
July 30, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
July 29, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
July 29, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
July 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service on Treasurer and Superintendent |
||
July 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Personal Service on Town Clerk |
||
July 22, 2021 | PETITION | ||
July 22, 2021 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.