Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Ucmt-Separation Judgement case in the jurisdiction of Greene County. This case was filed in Greene County Superior Courts with GEORGE J. PULVER, JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGEORGE J. PULVER, JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2008 |
CategoryUcmt-Separation Judgement |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationGreene County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time106 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2008 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) PULVER, JR. (Motion Part) Judge: GEORGE J. PULVER, JR |
|
October 15, 2008 | Hearing |
POST-JUDGEMENT PULVER, JR. (Court Activity) Judge: GEORGE J. PULVER, JR |
|
August 27, 2008 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) PULVER, JR. (Motion Part) Judge: GEORGE J. PULVER, JR |
|
August 27, 2008 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) PULVER, JR. (Motion Part) Judge: GEORGE J. PULVER, JR |
|
August 27, 2008 | Hearing |
POST-NOTE OF ISSUE RESTORATION PULVER, JR. (Court Activity) Judge: GEORGE J. PULVER, JR |
|
August 27, 2008 | Motion |
JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (Motion #002) Decided: 10/15/2008GRANTED Before Justice: GEORGE J. PULVER, JR Answer demanded: No Judge: GEORGE J. PULVER, JR |
|
July 17, 2008 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) PULVER, JR. (Motion Part) Judge: GEORGE J. PULVER, JR |
|
July 14, 2008 | Hearing |
PRE-DECIDED PULVER, JR. (Court Activity) Judge: GEORGE J. PULVER, JR |
|
July 01, 2008 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) PULVER, JR. (Motion Part) Judge: GEORGE J. PULVER, JR |
|
July 01, 2008 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE FILED PULVER, JR. (Court Activity) Judge: GEORGE J. PULVER, JR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.