Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Credit Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shur, Joseph M, against James Bachorski Aka James J Bachorski, Rose Bachorski Aka Rose M Bachorski, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: September 15, 2023ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: December 19, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: December 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 18, 2023ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: March 21, 2023NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: March 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 19, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 17, 2023202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: February 23, 2023ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: February 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 20, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: March 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT *Corrected*
Date: March 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 17, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: March 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2023 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
December 19, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 18, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT |
||
September 15, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
March 21, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT Co-D non-military affidavit |
||
March 21, 2023 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
March 21, 2023 | NOTICE OF REJECTION | ||
March 20, 2023 | affidavit of compliance | ||
March 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION statute of limitations affirmation |
||
March 20, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT *Corrected* non-military affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.