Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association D B A Elan Financial Services, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Jakas, Joseph Karl, Maida, Stephanie Marie, Verhagen, Jason Peter, against Terri L Shergill, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts with Diane Devlin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 03, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 03, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 03, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 03, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 17, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 21, 2022202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: February 07, 2023202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: December 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: February 17, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 18, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 17, 2023JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: March 22, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: March 22, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 22, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 17, 2023ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: March 22, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 07, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 22, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 22, 2023 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
March 22, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 22, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Military Affidavit |
||
March 22, 2023 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
March 22, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 07, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER Signed Order for Summary Judgment |
||
February 17, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1) | ||
February 17, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.