Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, against Ryan Edwards, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 26, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 12, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 12, 2022202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: July 18, 2022AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 26, 2022ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: August 30, 2022AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 26, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: August 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 26, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 26, 2022AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 26, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2022 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
August 30, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
August 26, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
August 26, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
August 26, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
August 26, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
August 26, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
August 26, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
August 26, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
July 18, 2022 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.