Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Brian Bodine, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: March 03, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: March 09, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 10, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 10, 2020COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: January 09, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 20, 2022CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: January 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2023 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION | ||
January 09, 2023 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
December 20, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REJECTION LETTER |
||
March 09, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL MAILING (COPY) |
||
March 03, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
February 10, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT INDX # APPL |
||
February 10, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.