Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Crystal Dickes, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts with Charles N Zambito presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles N Zambito Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 13, 2008 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: July 08, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 23, 2008EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 22, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 23, 2008ORDER - VACATING JUDGMENT
Date: September 14, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 02, 2008RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: August 12, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 02, 2008OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 13, 2008OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 13, 2008CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: July 08, 2021EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: August 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: August 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2021 | ORDER - VACATING JUDGMENT | ||
August 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Judgment |
||
August 12, 2021 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
August 12, 2021 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
August 12, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP | ||
July 22, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 08, 2021 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION | ||
July 08, 2021 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
September 02, 2008 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT STMT FOR JGMT DOC# 3081701/EXHIBITS |
||
September 02, 2008 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT (COPY)/EXHIBITS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.