Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Johnson, Heather Ann, against Tammy F Dilcher, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 06, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 04, 2022 | Affidavit of Mail Service | ||
August 04, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
August 25, 2021 |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Settlement |
||
August 25, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 20, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
August 10, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 06, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Tammy Dilcher |
||
July 06, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.