Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Digiaro, Michael, Florio, Michael James, against Kelly Mogavero, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts with Charles N Zambito presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles N Zambito Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 29, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 26, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 26, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 29, 2018COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: August 12, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 26, 2021CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: August 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 13, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 04, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 26, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 29, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 26, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 10, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 15, 2022AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 10, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 26, 2021ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: October 14, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: August 26, 2021AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 15, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 31, 2021AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 15, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: July 26, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 15, 2022 |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
July 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
July 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
July 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
June 10, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 10, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 14, 2021 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
September 13, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 13, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.