Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Beneficial Homeowner Service Corporation, Christiana Trust Tr, Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Heaney, Alexandra Rose, against Capital One Auto Finance Inc, John Wahr, Sherri Wahr, in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts with Charles N Zambito presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles N Zambito Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2015 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ANSWER
Date: February 25, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 26, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 26, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 26, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 26, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 28, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 28, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 04, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 26, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 06, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 28, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 02, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 08, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 09, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: March 15, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 08, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: March 03, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 09, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF MOTION/AFFIRM OF REGULARITY/AFFIRM/AFF IN SUPPORT/EXHIBITS
Date: November 28, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 20, 2016OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 09, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 26, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 26, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 03, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 09, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 16, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 04, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 09, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 27, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 16, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 09, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 19, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: March 27, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 04, 2015OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: March 02, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 13, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 13, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 13, 2021CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: July 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 18, 2021ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: September 28, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 16, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 28, 2021CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: June 07, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: June 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2021 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
September 28, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS & DISCONTINUANCE OF ACTION |
||
August 18, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
August 16, 2021 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #4) updated court date |
||
August 13, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #4) Notice of Pendency |
||
August 13, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #4) Order of Reference |
||
August 13, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Copies of the Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Pendency |
||
August 13, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #4) Copy of the Consent to Change Attorney |
||
August 13, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #4) Copies of the Answer and Notice of Appearance |
||
August 13, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.