Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts with Robert C. Noonan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Noonan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 19, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time120 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) GRISANTI (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MARK J. GRISANTI |
|
September 16, 2015 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT GRISANTI (Court Activity) Judge: HON. MARK J. GRISANTI |
|
September 11, 2015 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) GRISANTI (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MARK J. GRISANTI |
|
August 27, 2015 | Motion |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE - SMF (Motion #002) Decided: 09/16/2015SG&R SASE (SCHILLER) Before Justice: HON. MARK J. GRISANTI Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. MARK J. GRISANTI |
|
August 27, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) GRISANTI (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MARK J. GRISANTI |
|
July 14, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) GRISANTI (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MARK J. GRISANTI |
|
July 10, 2015 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) GRISANTI (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MARK J. GRISANTI |
|
July 06, 2015 | Motion |
ORDER OF REFERENCE (Motion #001) Decided: 07/14/2015SG&R SASE (SCHILLER), J. RIZZO Before Justice: HON. MARK J. GRISANTI Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. MARK J. GRISANTI |
|
July 06, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) GRISANTI (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MARK J. GRISANTI |
|
July 06, 2015 | Hearing |
TRANSFERRED FROM IAS JUSTICE NOONAN (Court Activity) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.