Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Genesee County, NY, . Genesee County, NY Superior Courts with HON. MARK J. GRISANTI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. MARK J. GRISANTI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2016 |
CategoryContested Matrimonial |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time63 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2016 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE FILED GRISANTI (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON. MARK J. GRISANTI |
|
August 19, 2015 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE COUNTY COURT FA (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: GENESEE COUNTY COURT FACILITY, |
|
August 13, 2015 | Hearing |
PRE-SETTLED GRISANTI (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON. MARK J. GRISANTI |
|
June 18, 2015 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE COUNTY COURT FA (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: GENESEE COUNTY COURT FACILITY, |
|
June 11, 2015 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE COUNTY COURT FA (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: GENESEE COUNTY COURT FACILITY, |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.