Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Genesee County. This case was filed in Genesee County Superior Courts with HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2015 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time75 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2015 | Hearing |
PRE-SETTLED NOONAN (Court Activity) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
March 20, 2015 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) NOONAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
March 12, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) NOONAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
February 27, 2015 | Motion |
COMPEL - WITHDRAWN (Motion #001) Decided: 03/12/2015WITHDRAWN Before Justice: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
February 27, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) NOONAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.