Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Genesee County. This case was filed in Genesee County Superior Courts with Robert C. Noonan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 20, 2015 |
CategoryTort-Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time364 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2015 | Hearing |
Held County Court Fa (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
|
August 21, 2015 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE COUNTY COURT FA (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: GENESEE COUNTY COURT FACILITY, |
|
August 19, 2015 | Hearing |
Settled Noonan (Court Activity) Judge: Noonan, Hon. Robert C. |
|
August 19, 2015 | Hearing |
PRE-SETTLED NOONAN (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
June 12, 2015 | Hearing |
Held County Court Fa (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
|
June 12, 2015 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE COUNTY COURT FA (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: GENESEE COUNTY COURT FACILITY, |
|
March 20, 2015 | Hearing |
Held County Court Fa (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
|
March 20, 2015 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE COUNTY COURT FA (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: GENESEE COUNTY COURT FACILITY, |
|
August 22, 2014 | Hearing |
Held County Court Fa (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
|
August 22, 2014 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE COUNTY COURT FA (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: GENESEE COUNTY COURT FACILITY, |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.