Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Genesee County. This case was filed in Genesee County Superior Courts with HON. MICHAEL F. GRIFFITH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 14, 2015 |
CategoryRes. Foreclosure Conf Eligible |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGenesee County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) NOONAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
May 20, 2015 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT NOONAN (Court Activity) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
May 15, 2015 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) NOONAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
April 14, 2015 | Motion |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SA (Motion #002) Decided: 05/20/2015SG&R SASE (FEIN) - SMF FILED Before Justice: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
April 14, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) NOONAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
December 30, 2014 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) NOONAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
December 19, 2014 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) NOONAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
October 31, 2014 | Motion |
ORDER OF REFERENCE (Motion #001) Decided: 12/30/2014SG&R SASE (FEIN), R. MORAN APT Before Justice: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
October 31, 2014 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) NOONAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT C. NOONAN |
|
September 10, 2013 | Hearing |
TRANSFERRED FROM IAS JUSTICE GRIFFITH (Court Activity) Judge: HON. MICHAEL F. GRIFFITH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.