Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
David T Loughran, Joyce L Loughran, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Manne, Karl Erik, against Mark T Souza, Theresa L Souza, represented by Wood, Jeremiah, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, NY, . Fulton County, NY Superior Courts with Martin D Auffredou presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMartin D Auffredou Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Boundary Line Dispute) |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFulton County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 21, 2021REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: October 28, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 31, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 08, 2021ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 26, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 03, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 03, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: February 07, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 03, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: February 07, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 01, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER *Corrected*
Date: February 07, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 06, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 06, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Mediation in-person 6-2-22 |
||
April 06, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 01, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT sched prelim conf |
||
February 07, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 07, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
February 07, 2022 |
RJI -RE: OTHER *Corrected* Boundary line dispute |
||
January 03, 2022 | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | ||
January 03, 2022 | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
January 03, 2022 | DEMAND FOR: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.