Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Seibel, Scott, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Pacheco, Mark, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with J. Michael Byrne presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 18, 2006 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer Residential Limited (32) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions30 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time30 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Writ (Filed) 236120-Writ: Filed Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per WRIT: FILED [236120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PLAINTIFF PRO PER [912120] |
|
February 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Writ (Issued) 236110-Writ: Issued Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per WRIT: ISSUED [236110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PLAINTIFF PRO PER [912120] |
|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment 226110-Judgment Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per JUDGMENT [226110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PLAINTIFF PRO PER [912120] |
|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Jan 17 2007 Type: 244710 - Judgment: Court Finding Manner : 251110 - After Court Trial |
|
January 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Court Trial: Short Cause 251110-Court Trial: Short Cause; Seibel, S. vs Pacheco, M. ; Judge: J21216 Byrne J. Michael Judge: Byrne, J. Michael |
|
January 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 212310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per PROOF OF SERVICE [212310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PLAINTIFF PRO PER [912120] |
|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed 222120-Summons: Filed Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per SUMMONS: FILED [222120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PLAINTIFF PRO PER [912120] |
|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed 212210-Complaint Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per COMPLAINT [212210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PLAINTIFF PRO PER [912120] |
|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 212920-Notice of Hearing Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk NOTICE OF HEARING [212920] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.