Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Lisa Pickerign, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 25, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions112 days |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 25, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 18, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: February 19, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2020 | JUDGMENT | ||
February 14, 2020 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
February 14, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENT |
||
February 14, 2020 | AFFIRMATION | ||
February 14, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
February 14, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
December 20, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING |
||
December 20, 2019 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
December 18, 2019 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 18, 2019 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.