Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Gary R Garrand, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 03, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: December 02, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 03, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 04, 2019ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: December 06, 2019NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: November 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 04, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 06, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2020 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
December 06, 2019 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
December 06, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING OF ADDITIONAL MAILING |
||
December 04, 2019 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 04, 2019 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 02, 2019 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
October 03, 2019 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.