Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rebecca Charland, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Meyer, Justin Robert, against Adirondack Region Chiropractic Pc, John Fleury, Real Estate Fleury, represented by Germain, Matthew Paul, Krzykowski, Brian P., in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts with John T Ellis presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management238 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Negligence (Slip &Amp; Fall)) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 21, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: June 05, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 05, 2019ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: November 12, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 09, 2019ANSWER
Date: March 12, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 05, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 01, 2019REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: April 05, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 01, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 05, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 01, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 09, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 05, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 05, 2019DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 05, 2019ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 05, 2019DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 05, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 16, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 23, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: February 19, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 04, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 29, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2021 | Hearing |
TRIAL SET FOR ELLIS (Trial Part) Held Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
June 01, 2021 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ELLIS (Pre-Trial Conference) Held Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
December 09, 2020 | Motion |
MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE JPN IN PL (Motion #002) Decided: 12/09/2020GRANTED Before Justice: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
December 09, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) ELLIS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
December 09, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) ELLIS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
August 31, 2020 | Hearing |
TRIAL SET FOR ELLIS (Trial Part) Held Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
June 05, 2020 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
June 04, 2020 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
June 01, 2020 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge re: date of Jury Trial |
||
May 26, 2020 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ELLIS (Pre-Trial Conference) Held Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.