Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Michael V Devlin, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 12, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 12, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 12, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 04, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: March 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 12, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: March 31, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: July 12, 2021ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: August 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 22, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
March 22, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
March 22, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
August 11, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING OF ADDITIONAL NOTICE |
||
August 11, 2021 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
August 04, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 04, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 12, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
July 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B MILITARY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.