Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Nicole M. Hawkins, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Mccann, Thomas H., against Scott A. Hawkins, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts with Robert G Main presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert G Main Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2021 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
July 20, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
July 20, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
July 20, 2021 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
July 20, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
July 19, 2021 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
June 17, 2021 | COMPLAINT | ||
May 28, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
May 28, 2021 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
May 28, 2021 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.