Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates,Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Jordan, Tarah Eve, against Joseph Barnes, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 20, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 20, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: July 14, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 02, 2020JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 06, 2021ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: December 02, 2020AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 06, 2021AFFIRMATION CHANGE OF ADDRESS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 27, 2020AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 06, 2021AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 06, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 27, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 06, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR JUDGMENT Redacted |
||
July 06, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted |
||
July 06, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
July 06, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION CHANGE OF ADDRESS Redacted per 22 NYCRR CHANGE OF ADDRESS Redacted |
||
July 06, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
July 06, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
July 06, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
December 02, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING OF ADDITIONAL NOTICE |
||
December 02, 2020 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.