Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates,Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Leiderman, Joel D, Watts, Valerie Elizabeth, against Melissa Ford, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 26, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions122 days |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: June 18, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: March 29, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 05, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2020 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
June 04, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT FULLY SATISFIED INCOME EXECUTION |
||
March 29, 2019 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 28, 2019 |
AFFIRMATION NON MIL Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MIL Redacted |
||
March 28, 2019 |
AFFIRMATION DOD Redacted per 22 NYCRR DOD Redacted |
||
March 28, 2019 |
AFFIRMATION AFFIDAVIT OF NON EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT OF NON EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATION Redacted |
||
March 28, 2019 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted |
||
March 28, 2019 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted |
||
March 28, 2019 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
January 17, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT COPY ADDITIONAL MAILING ENVELOPE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.