Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates,Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Leiderman, Joel D, against Scott Wilber, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Case Cycle Time254 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 16, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 11, 2019NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: July 18, 2019ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: February 21, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 16, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 21, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2019 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF DISCONTINUING ACTION |
||
April 11, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT RETURNED MAIL (ADDITIONAL NOTICE) |
||
February 21, 2019 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
February 21, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING ADDITIONAL MAILING |
||
February 16, 2019 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
February 16, 2019 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 06, 2018 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT E311936412604 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.