Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts with HON. S. PETER FELDSTEIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 30, 2017 |
CategoryArticle 78 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Case Cycle Time180 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE-TRANSFER TO APPELLATE FELDSTEIN (Court Activity) Judge: HON. S. PETER FELDSTEIN |
|
September 26, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) FELDSTEIN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. S. PETER FELDSTEIN |
|
July 07, 2017 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #003) FELDSTEIN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. S. PETER FELDSTEIN |
|
July 07, 2017 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) FELDSTEIN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. S. PETER FELDSTEIN |
|
July 07, 2017 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) FELDSTEIN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. S. PETER FELDSTEIN |
|
April 04, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #003) FELDSTEIN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. S. PETER FELDSTEIN |
|
April 04, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) FELDSTEIN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. S. PETER FELDSTEIN |
|
March 30, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) FELDSTEIN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. S. PETER FELDSTEIN |
|
March 30, 2017 | Motion |
OTSC - ART. 78 (Motion #001) Decided: 09/26/2017TRANSFERRED TO AD3D Before Justice: HON. S. PETER FELDSTEIN Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. S. PETER FELDSTEIN |
|
March 30, 2017 | Motion |
POOR PERSON (Motion #002) Decided: 04/04/2017GRANTED $15 Before Justice: HON. S. PETER FELDSTEIN Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. S. PETER FELDSTEIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.