Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Mclp Asset Company, Inc.,, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Donna Urban, Joe Urban, John Doe 1 Through John Doe 12 The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises, Described In The Complaint,, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NY, . Essex County, NY Superior Courts with Allison M. Mcgahay presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationEssex County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Essex. The plaintiff, MCLP Asset Company, Inc., is suing the defendants Joe Urban, Donna Urban, and the New York State Department of Taxation and Finance. The subject pr...
ANSWER
Date: October 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 26, 2023FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM
Date: December 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 09, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 17, 2023NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 17, 2023NOTICE
Date: November 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 17, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: November 17, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 05, 2023RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 05, 2023CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: September 19, 2023NOTICE OF OPT-OUT (ATTORNEY)
Date: October 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 05, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: September 19, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: September 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 19, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2023 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM | ||
November 17, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER Standing Order and Order of Reference Relating to Poor Person Applications |
||
November 17, 2023 | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
November 17, 2023 |
NOTICE Judicial Assignment Notice |
||
November 17, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 17, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
November 17, 2023 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
October 12, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
October 12, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 12, 2023 | NOTICE OF OPT-OUT (ATTORNEY) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.