Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
North East Underlayments, Llc Dba North East Spray Foam, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by O'Sullivan, Jill Elizabeth, against Erik Obey, Savannah Mccafferty-Doviak, represented by Wilkins, John T., in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NY, . Essex County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 08, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Foreclosure Of Mechanic'S) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationEssex County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: September 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 09, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: September 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 07, 2023REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: September 28, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 07, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 08, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT Executed Verification of Reply to Counterclaims |
||
September 28, 2023 | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | ||
September 27, 2023 |
PROOF OF SERVICE Amended Affidavit of Service upon E. Obey |
||
September 27, 2023 |
PROOF OF SERVICE Amended Affidavit of Service upon S. McCafferty-Doviak |
||
September 19, 2023 |
PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service upon S. McCafferty-Doviak |
||
September 19, 2023 |
PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service upon E. Obey |
||
September 07, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT Verification page for the Answer |
||
September 07, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
August 08, 2023 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
August 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice Under Mechanic's Lien Law |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.