Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Slic Network Solutions, Inc., filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Zomerfeld, Henry Anthony, against Assessor For The Town Of Newcomb, New York, Board Of Assessment Review For The Town Of Newcomb, New York, Town Of Newcomb, New York, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NY, . Essex County, NY Superior Courts with Allison M. Mcgahay presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEssex County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 11, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 08, 2023NOTICE
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 30, 2023PETITION
Date: July 30, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: July 30, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S)
Date: July 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service by Mail of Notice of Petition, Verified Petition with Exhibits, RJI, NYSCEF Con Affidavit of Service by Mail of Notice of Petition, Verified Petition with Exhibits, RJI, NYSCEF Con ... show more |
||
August 11, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 08, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
July 31, 2023 |
NOTICE Judicial Assignment Notice |
||
July 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B NYS Cable Company Listing |
||
July 30, 2023 | PETITION | ||
July 30, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION | ||
July 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A FCC Cable Operations and Licensing System Listing |
||
July 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Franchise Agreement Listing |
||
July 30, 2023 | NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.