Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Kasey Mckenna, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NY, . Essex County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 08, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationEssex County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 08, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 09, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 25, 2023STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: January 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
January 09, 2023 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
December 09, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 05, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 08, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 08, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.