Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Gunther, Tess E, against Vicki Witherbee, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NY, . Essex County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationEssex County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
November 12, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 06, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 06, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 02, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
September 20, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Q64689816028 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.