Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Donald T Plumley, Geraldine V Plumley, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Silvestri, John M., against Harold Brown, Sherylee R Brown, represented by Berube, Paula Nadeau, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NY, . Essex County, NY Superior Courts with Glen Bruening presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 22, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Article 15) |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationEssex County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: October 22, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 05, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: October 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: October 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: October 22, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: December 22, 2020THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: February 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: October 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: October 22, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 05, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 11, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 03, 2021ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: May 27, 2021REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: January 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 11, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: October 22, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 22, 2020AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 04, 2021ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: May 27, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 08, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: June 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION
Date: December 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 05, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 22, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 13, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: April 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge requesting conference |
||
April 13, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
April 13, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
December 05, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) EXHIBIT E |
||
December 05, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) EXHIBIT G |
||
December 05, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION | ||
December 05, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) EXHIBIT A |
||
December 05, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) EXHIBIT B |
||
December 05, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) EXHIBIT D |
||
December 05, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) EXHIBIT C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.