Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NY, . Essex County, NY Superior Courts with Richard B. Meyer presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management108 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2018 |
||
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2020 |
||
Filing LocationEssex County, NY |
||
Case Cycle Time461 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2019 | Hearing |
Settled
Judge: Meyer, Hon. Richard B. |
|
April 27, 2018 | Hearing |
Preliminary Conference Meyer (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Meyer, Hon. Richard B. |
|
March 19, 2018 | Hearing |
Note of Issue Filed Meyer (Court Activity) Judge: Meyer, Hon. Richard B. |
|
January 19, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Meyer (Motion Part) Judge: Meyer, Hon. Richard B. |
|
January 10, 2018 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 01/19/2018Decided Before Justice: Meyer, Hon. Richard B. Answer demanded: No Judge: Meyer, Hon. Richard B. |
|
January 10, 2018 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #001) Meyer (Motion Part) Judge: Meyer, Hon. Richard B. |
|
January 09, 2018 | Motion |
Divorce (Motion #002) Decided: 10/21/2019Granted Before Justice: Meyer, Hon. Richard B. Answer demanded: No Judge: Meyer, Hon. Richard B. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.