Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NY, . Essex County, NY Superior Courts with Bruening, Hon. Glen T. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 10, 2017 |
CategoryRp-Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationEssex County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Cycle Time105 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Bruening,A.J.S. (Motion Part) Judge: Bruening, Hon. Glen T. |
|
June 16, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided Bruening,A.J.S. (Court Activity) Judge: Bruening, Hon. Glen T. |
|
June 01, 2017 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #001) Bruening,A.J.S. (Motion Part) Judge: Bruening, Hon. Glen T. |
|
April 17, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Bruening,A.J.S. (Motion Part) Judge: Bruening, Hon. Glen T. |
|
March 10, 2017 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 06/23/2017Decided Before Justice: Bruening, Hon. Glen T. Answer demanded: No Judge: Bruening, Hon. Glen T. |
|
March 10, 2017 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #001) Bruening,A.J.S. (Motion Part) Judge: Bruening, Hon. Glen T. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.