Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts with Feroleto, Hon. Paula L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 03, 2018 |
CategoryMat-Uncontested |
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time111 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2018 | Hearing |
Judgment Granted Part 1 Judge: Feroleto, Hon. Paula L. |
|
June 27, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned Part 1 Judge: Feroleto, Hon. Paula L. |
|
May 08, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned Court Attorney Referee Notaro Judge: Feroleto, Hon. Paula L. |
|
April 03, 2018 | Motion |
Poor Person (Motion #001) Decided: 04/27/2018Granted Before Justice: Feroleto, Hon. Paula L. Answer demanded: No Judge: Feroleto, Hon. Paula L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.