Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Arrick, Dana Marie, Hughes, Adam Michael, against Abeer A Manea, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 20, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions169 days |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Case Cycle Time366 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 20, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: November 21, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2019 | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on November 21, 2019 | ||
May 08, 2019 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
May 08, 2019 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
May 08, 2019 | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | ||
May 08, 2019 |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
March 19, 2019 | COURT NOTICE | ||
March 13, 2019 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 20, 2018 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 20, 2018 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.