Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kayla Fox, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Todoro, Joseph Anthony, Verrastro, James Peter, against Kevin J. Schmitt, Rebecca Schmitt, represented by Bruce, Elizabeth Anne, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with Raymond Walter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRaymond Walter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2019ANSWER
Date: March 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 19, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 18, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 06, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: January 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 18, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 11, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) IME Report |
||
January 18, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Pl's BOP |
||
January 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Pleadings |
||
January 18, 2023 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
January 18, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
January 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Pl's EBT |
||
January 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Pearson Rad Review |
||
June 14, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.