Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
In The Matter Of The Arbitration Of Certain Controversies Between Progressive Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Graff, Kevin Jay, against Richard Pirritano, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with Frank A Sedita presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
|
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
|
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time37 days |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: December 30, 2019ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001)
Date: February 03, 2020NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001)
Date: December 30, 2019PETITION
Date: December 30, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001) | |
January 29, 2020 | Hearing |
Granted (Motion #001)
Judge: Sedita III, Hon. Frank A. |
|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION | |
December 30, 2019 | Motion |
Confirm/Disapprove Award/Report (Motion #001) Decided: 01/29/2020Granted Answer demanded: No Judge: Decided: 01/29/2020Granted |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Arbitration Award |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Demand for Arbitration |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Dec Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.